THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:15:44 AM
Cotter, Jill Erin
CPSO#:
76198
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
221 Nelson Street
Ottawa ON K1N 1C7
Phone: (613) 789-8458
Fax: (613) 789-8710
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Aug 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JILL ERIN COTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2005 |