THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:32:04 AM
Yamashita, Cory Masaru
CPSO#:
76188
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Room B3-116
268 Grosvenor Street.
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 66288
Fax: (519) 646-6404
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:12 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CORY MASARU YAMASHITA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAMASHITA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2005 |