THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:03:17 AM
Rose, Gregory Walter
CPSO#:
76187
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
210-770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: 613-680-9093
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:13 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY WALTER ROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
CF - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2006 |