THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:04:12 AM
Lo, Gregory Kwong-Kan
CPSO#:
76173
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
63 Darling Dr
Ennismore ON K0L 1T0
Phone: 705-772-7745
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 10 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY KWONG-KAN LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2019 |