THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:14:18 AM
Vowinckel, Erika Ann Meta
CPSO#:
76160
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
River Medical Centre
677 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON M5A2C2
Phone: (416) 362-8777
Fax: (416) 362-7879
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vowinckel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 26 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Sep 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIKA ANN META VOWINCKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOWINCKEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2005 |