THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:17:23 PM
Valadka, Saulius Mikas
CPSO#:
76159
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Lithuanian
Education: Queen's University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 6243
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAULIUS MIKAS VALADKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALADKA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2007 |