THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:11:59 AM
Nag, Sanjita
CPSO#:
76153
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Mar 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
13291 Yonge St
Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
Richmond Hill ON L4E 4L6
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For medical record inquiries please contact Dr. Mark Waxman.
Urgent Care
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby, ON L1N 2L1
Tel: 905 436 3240
Date Received: 02 Nov 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Feb 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2004 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
|
Active |