THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:08:14 PM
Bussiere, Miguel Edgar
CPSO#:
76145
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Miguel Bussiere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2012
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Neurology
C-2174 Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2014 |