THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:34:17 PM
Gray, Jonathan David
CPSO#:
76143
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Forensic Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6361
Fax: (613) 798-2992
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2003 to 21 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |