THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:20:38 PM
Nadkarni, Dipti Ashok
CPSO#:
76139
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 221
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 935-3746
Fax: (613) 935-3694
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:20 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIPTI ASHOK NADKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADKARNI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 08 Jan 2009 to 31 May 2009
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |