THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:10:39 AM
Rassouli-Rashti, Mohammad
CPSO#:
76131
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Toronto, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4450
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: May 5, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 26, 2012, Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Rassouli-Rashti’s on-call privileges and privileges to provide in-patient consultations were temporarily suspended, effective May 15, 2012.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 May 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD RASSOULI-RASHTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASSOULI-RASHTI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2005 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2009 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 12 Apr 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2016 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Oct 2008
Summary:
On October 20, 2008, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. RassouliRashti committed professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; and that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.
On February 13, 2009, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar suspend Dr. RassouliRashti(s educational certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months starting March 13, 2009, two months of which shall be suspended if Dr. RassouliRashti completes, at his own expense, the College(s Medical Ethics course and provides proof thereof to the College.
2. Dr. RassouliRashti attend before the panel to be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded in the Register.
3. Dr. RassouliRashti pay costs of the hearing in the amount of $5,000, within twelve months of the date of this order.
On March 11, 2009, Dr. RassouliRashti filed a Notice of Appeal of the decision to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to ss.25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee is stayed pending the outcome of the appeal.
On November 10, 2009, the Divisional Court dismissed the appeal. Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 2009-11-10
Hearing Date(s): Jun 17, 2008