THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:06:53 PM
Gandhi, Rajiv
CPSO#:
76096
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Orthopedics
Toronto Western Hospital
E W 1-439
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5642
Fax: (416) 603-3437
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJIV GANDHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANDHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |