THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:07:08 AM
Silvera, Dwight Andrew
CPSO#:
76094
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Dwight A. Silvera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 7 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |