THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:13:53 AM
Boodhwani, Munir
CPSO#:
76045
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiac Surgery H3405
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7295
Fax: (613) 696-7302
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUNIR BOODHWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOODHWANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |