THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:35:41 AM
Nguan, Oliver Yee Chih
CPSO#:
76026
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON K1V 2A4
Phone: (613) 739-3700
Fax: (613) 739-7043
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLIVER YEE CHIH NGUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2003 |