THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:07:47 AM
Shah, Jyotsna Prakeshkumar
CPSO#:
76006
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: Gujarat University, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Suite 19 - 231
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7031
Fax: (416) 586 8745
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:26 May 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 May 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 May 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2022 |
|
Active |