THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 10:14:59 AM
Rahman, Mohammed Ataur
CPSO#:
75998
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Road Medical Centre
7160 Markham Road
Markham ON L3S 3J8
Phone: (905) 472-7400
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ATAUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 May 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 May 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 May 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jul 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2002 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Aug 2007
Summary:
On August 23, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Rahman committed professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee ordered the following:
1. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Rahman(s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, to commence on June 1, 2008, which suspension shall be suspended in its entirety if prior to June 1, 2008, Dr. Rahman successfully completes, at his own expense, the Collegeapproved course in Medical Ethics and Informed Consent, and provides proof thereof to the College.
2. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Rahman to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. The Discipline Committee Orders Dr. Rahman to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.
4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 23, 2007