THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:16:48 AM
Fox, Susan Helen
CPSO#:
75984
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Oct 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Movement Disorder Clinic
399 Bathurst Street MC7 421
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6422
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:23 Oct 2003 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Apr 2001 to 15 Jun 2001
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2010 |
|
Active |