THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:41:04 PM
Ibrahim, Khaled Mohamed Omar
CPSO#:
75982
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300G Fourth Ave
Unit 203
Clinic
St Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Phone: 9053977766
Fax: 9053973424
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:21 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHALED MOHAMED OMAR IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2008 |