THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:12:28 AM
Beletsky, Vadim
CPSO#:
75976
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Beletsky, Vadim Yurievitch (used until: 30 Sep 2014 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: I.M. Sechenov Moscow Medical Academy, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care London
Parkwood Institute H4
PO BOX 5777 / STN B
London ON N6A 4V2
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: 519-455-5110
Fax: 519-661-1610
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Jul 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VADIM BELETSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELETSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 May 2002 to 27 May 2003
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 May 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2014 |