THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:44:45 AM
Vivoda, Edward Ernest
CPSO#:
75971
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jan 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
113 John St. South
Aylmer ON N5H 2C3
Phone: (519) 765-1960
Fax: (519) 765-2971
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD ERNEST VIVODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIVODA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Apr 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2002 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2019 |