THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:31:48 PM
Todd, David Charles
CPSO#:
75965
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Rockhaven Lane
Suite 106
Waterdown ON L8B 1B5
Phone: (905) 390-3033
Fax: (905) 390-2999
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:14 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES TODD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TODD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Apr 2001 to 06 May 2001
EL - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 May 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2004 |