THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 12:15:00 PM
Freytag, Angelika Gabriele
CPSO#:
75940
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Sep 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Italian
Education: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5734 Yonge St
Dynamic Medical Center
North York ON M2M 4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANGELIKA GABRIELE FREYTAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREYTAG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2011 |