THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:43:41 PM
Zaarour, Christian Elias
CPSO#:
75937
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Lebanese University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Apr 2004 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
|
Active |