THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:56:51 PM
Schellenberg, Roberta Sandra
CPSO#:
75923
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 May 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
780 Midpark Dr
Kingston ON K7M 7P6
Phone: 613-5074457
Fax: 613-507-4458
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:23 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERTA SANDRA SCHELLENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHELLENBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2001 to 09 Apr 2001
EL - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2009 |