THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:49:57 AM
Balki, Mrinalini
CPSO#:
75922
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
12 Aug 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Balki, Mrinalini Sunil (used until: 04 Aug 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: Nagpur University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue, Room 19-104
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Feb 2024 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2001 to 11 Mar 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2002 to 11 Mar 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2003 to 12 Mar 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 11 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Apr 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |