THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 22:04:14 PM
Tobe, Lauren Evanna
CPSO#:
75921
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAUREN EVANNA TOBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOBE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2001 to 31 Mar 2001
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2004 |