THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:31:40 PM
Finch, Susan Jane
CPSO#:
75912
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Feb 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Susan J. Finch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Kingston Health Sciences Centre
166 Brock Street
Kingston, ON K7L5G2
Date Received: 22 Apr 2020
Instructions/Address:Patients may contact the facility where they were seen by Dr. Finch to obtain their medical records.
1. Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
Tel: 613-544-3400
2. Street Health Centre - KCHC
235 Wellington St
Kingston, ON K7K 0B5
3. Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Dr
Moose Factory, ON P0L 1W0
Date Received: 18 Jun 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |