THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:10:50 PM
Wiss, Raymond Joseph Ren'
CPSO#:
75895
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Feb 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Raymond Joseph Rene Wiss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2021 |