THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:53:59 PM
Quenneville, Michel Lionel
CPSO#:
75881
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jan 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jan 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
400 Avenue Spence
Hawkesbury ON K6A 2Y3
Phone: (613) 632-0997
Fax: (613) 632-9297
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: September 21, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On June 4, 2020, Hawkesbury General Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Michel Lionel Quenneville had agreed to a leave of absence in November 2019. He returned to the hospital in January 2020, on a probationary basis. On April 23, 2020, his privileges were temporarily suspended.
On July 10, 2020, , Hawkesbury General Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Quenneville had again agreed to change the status of his leave to a voluntary leave of absence for an indefinite period of time.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHEL LIONEL QUENNEVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUENNEVILLE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2001 |