THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 13:20:29 PM
Boskovic, Radinka
CPSO#:
75880
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Serbian
Education: Universit of Tuzla, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Clarington FHO
Suite 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: (905) 623-9607
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RADINKA BOSKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOSKOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jun 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Dec 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 2011 |