THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:12:45 AM
Gorodetsky, Olga Leonidovna
CPSO#:
75868
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLGA LEONIDOVNA GORODETSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORODETSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Care of the Elderly
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Care of the Elderly
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
CF - Care of the Elderly
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2003 |