THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:15:20 AM
Jokhio, Raza Mustafa
CPSO#:
75833
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu
Education: University of Sind, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dynamic Medical Centre
5734 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M2M 4E7
Phone: (416) 222-5501
Fax: (416) 222-1932
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:24 May 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAZA MUSTAFA JOKHIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOKHIO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jul 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2003 |