THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:53:20 PM
Cybulski, Peter Andrew
CPSO#:
75803
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1Z0
Phone: 5197494300
Fax: 8449892035
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER ANDREW CYBULSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYBULSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 28 Feb 2001
EL - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |