THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:18:47 AM
Shelig, Khaled Saed
CPSO#:
75801
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
1580 20th Street East
Owen Sound ON N4K 5P5
Phone: 5193729951
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 May 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:21 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHALED SAED SHELIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHELIG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2006 |