THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:02:49 PM
Backway, Karen Lynn
CPSO#:
75789
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Karen Backway Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:07 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2001 to 04 Feb 2001
EL - Paediatric Haematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Feb 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2017 |