THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:23:22 AM
Dagnone, Andrew Joel
CPSO#:
75785
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
400-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Phone: 416-622-2700
Fax: 416-622-4355
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:18 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOEL DAGNONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAGNONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 02 Jan 2001 to 31 Mar 2001
EL - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2003 |