THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:10:42 PM
Kapur, Suneil
CPSO#:
75763
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Nov 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON K2H 9A5
Phone: (613) 422-3861
Fax: (613) 422-7538
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:11 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNEIL KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2003 |