THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:40:20 AM
Masnyk, Robert Douglas
CPSO#:
75760
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Phone: 1-800-267-6522
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS 111 St Regis Cres S Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 21 Mar 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:25 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT DOUGLAS MASNYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASNYK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2000 to 15 Dec 2000
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 04 Sep 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2003 |