THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:05:36 AM
El-Tair, Mervat Mohamed Mostafa
CPSO#:
75752
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: El-Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Manotick medical centre
Manotick
5230 mitch owens road
k4m1b2
Date Received: 31 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Nov 2000 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2000 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2022 |