THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:18:03 PM
Ravid-Einy, Anat
CPSO#:
75747
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical S, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
209-700 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8X 4T2
Phone: 519-258-4433
Fax: 519-258-8793
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANAT RAVID-EINY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVID-EINY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
CF - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2008 |