THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:24:42 PM
Brown, Deron Jeffrey
CPSO#:
75736
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
520 Ellesmere Rd
Suite 402
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: 6473686424
Fax: 4168407075
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Deron Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DERON JEFFREY BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Oct 2000 to 24 Nov 2000
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |