THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 16:37:34 PM
Mathers, Paul Gordon
CPSO#:
75731
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5544
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL GORDON MATHERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHERS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 May 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2008 |