THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:49:45 AM
Kirtsman, Irina
CPSO#:
75720
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Russian
Education: Rostovskij Medicinskij Institut, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240 Ext. 2251
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093 or [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 May 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRINA KIRTSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRTSMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2000 to 17 Nov 2000
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 07 May 2001 to 01 Jun 2001
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2002 |