THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:35:54 PM
Weberpals, Johanne Ingrid
CPSO#:
75702
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Gynecolologic Oncology
Room 8168
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 76462
Fax: (613) 737-8828
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHANNE INGRID WEBERPALS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBERPALS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2000 to 27 Oct 2000
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Oct 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2003 |