THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:25:04 AM
Poitier, Myles Robert
CPSO#:
75700
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Spartan Health Sciences University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
116-284 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6V 1C2
Phone: 905-455-6464
Fax: 905-452-1010
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahamas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Sep 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 02 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Oct 2001 to 02 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Oct 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
|
Active |