THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:38:10 AM
Lashevsky, Ilan
CPSO#:
75699
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Italian
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3080 Yonge Street
unit 4076
Toronto ON M4N 3N1
Phone: (647) 347-6644
Fax: (647) 347-6647
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. I. Lashevsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Apr 2006 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Apr 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Apr 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Apr 2013 |
|
Active |