THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:21:42 AM
El Ghamudi, Abdulhakim Amara A
CPSO#:
75698
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:16 Oct 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULHAKIM AMARA A EL GHAMUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL GHAMUDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2000 to 25 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2001 to 25 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 25 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2003 to 25 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2008 |