THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:57:33 AM
Kremenchutzky, Carlos Marcelo
CPSO#:
75615
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
01 Oct 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Sep 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
1-Oct-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kremenchutzky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 7 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:25 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jul 2002
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Apr 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 01 Oct 2018 |