THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:29:50 AM
Shahmalak, Shahzad Zafar
CPSO#:
75612
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-1150 Franklin Blvd
Apex Health Assessments
Cambridge ON N1R 7J2
Phone: 519-279-6546
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:26 May 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Oct 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2012 |
|
Active |